Global Patent Index - EP 1015709 A1

EP 1015709 A1 2000-07-05 - SOUNDPROOFING PRODUCT AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (en)

SOUNDPROOFING PRODUCT AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (de)

SCHALLDÄMPFENDE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

PRODUIT D'ISOLATION PHONIQUE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL PRODUIT

Publication

EP 1015709 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98944004 A

Priority

  • FR 9801985 W
  • FR 9711656 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2768448A1] Sound insulation material for walls comprises: (a) a first (wall-side) layer of polymer foam with a thickness of 1.5-5 mm; (b) a second layer that comprises a non-reinforced mixture of filled bitumen and at least one polymer and has a thickness of 1-3.5 mm; and (c) a third layer of finishing material for receiving a wall covering. Also claimed is the production of the material by pouring a mixture of filled bitumen and polymer(s) onto the first or third layer and adhering the other layer to the resulting second layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/84

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/82 (2006.01); E04B 1/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/8409 (2013.01); E04B 2001/8461 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914447A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2768448 A1 19990319; FR 2768448 B1 20000121; AU 9169398 A 19990405; DE 1015709 T1 20010503; EP 1015709 A1 20000705; ES 2152195 T1 20010201; HU 0004620 A2 20010528; HU 0004620 A3 20020128; IL 135005 D0 20010520; JP 2001516829 A 20011002; NO 20001346 A 20000515; NO 20001346 D0 20000315; PL 339341 A1 20001218; SK 3732000 A3 20001211; TR 200000643 T2 20000721; TW 401475 B 20000811; WO 9914447 A1 19990325

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-04 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1029382

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020626

2001-05-03 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

2001-03-21 [IECL] IE: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: IECL

2001-02-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: TCAT

2001-02-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BA2A

- Ref Document Number: 2152195

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T1

2001-02-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: TCNL

2000-12-27 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBC

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000418

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 20000418