Global Patent Index - EP 1015711 A1

EP 1015711 A1 2000-07-05 - A FLOOR ELEMENT, A STRUCTURE AND A METHOD FOR MOUNTING A FLOOR ELEMENT

Title (en)

A FLOOR ELEMENT, A STRUCTURE AND A METHOD FOR MOUNTING A FLOOR ELEMENT

Title (de)

BODENELEMENT, STRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZUM MONTIEREN EINES BODENELEMENTS

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE PLANCHER, STRUCTURE ET PROCEDE DE MONTAGE D'UN ELEMENT DE PLANCHER

Publication

EP 1015711 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98944336 A

Priority

  • NL 9800537 W
  • NL 1007049 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9914448A1] A floor element comprising an extruded section (1) provided with a trough-shaped part at its upper side, which trough-shaped part is filled with a flexible material (4) consisting of bonded-together grains of a flexible material. The section is made of aluminium, and the trough-shaped part has a substantially U-shaped cross section, with a bottom part (3) whose width is more than ten times the height of the two upright wall parts (2). The grains of a flexible material (4) consist substantially of rubber or a plastic material which resembles rubber, which grains are bonded together by means of a polyurethane resin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914448A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9914448 A1 19990325; AU 9189698 A 19990405; DE 69810320 D1 20030130; DE 69810320 T2 20030522; EP 1015711 A1 20000705; EP 1015711 B1 20021218; NL 1007049 C2 19990318

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140917

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140917

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130925

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131003

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-04-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810320 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810320 P 20030130

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRS IDEE B.V.

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020205

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000411

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL