Global patent index - EP 1015716 A1

EP 1015716 A1 2000-07-05 - A METHOD OF AND A DEVICE FOR OPERATING A POOL CLEANER

Title (en)

A METHOD OF AND A DEVICE FOR OPERATING A POOL CLEANER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEDIENUNG EINES SCHWIMMBECKENREINIGERS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN NETTOYEUR DE PISCINE

Publication

EP 1015716 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98923739 A

Priority

  • US 9810628 W
  • ZA 9702464 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9853164A1] A pumping system of a pool (10) pumps water through a pool cleaner (20) and hose (26) connected to a weir (18). Flow through the cleaner (20) is cyclically interrupted to repeatedly reciprocate the hose (26). A device (30) anchored to the weir (18) is coupled to the hose (26) via clip (38). The reciprocal motion of the hose (26) is transmitted to the device (30) where it is transduced to a swinging motion (42) via a lever (40) attached to the hose (26) via clip (36), whereby the hose (26) is moved cyclically in attitude and position to promote random motion of the cleaner (20) and to render the cleaner (20) less likely to get stuck.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 4/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 4/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 4/1645 (2013.01); E04H 4/1663 (2013.01); E04H 4/1636 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9853164 A1 19981126; AU 734929 B2 20010628; AU 7595798 A 19981211; DE 69839519 D1 20080703; EP 1015716 A1 20000705; EP 1015716 A4 20030910; EP 1015716 B1 20080521

INPADOC legal status

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080822

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080821

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080521

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090224

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080821

2009-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081021

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69839519

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-07-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

2008-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2007-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070614

2003-09-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20030728

2002-02-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FIXTRADE 782 (PTY) LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GROBLER, JOHANNES STEPHANUS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GROBLER, JOHANNES STEPHANUS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LOUW, ANDRE GERHARDUS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DE ASCENCAO, VICTOR EMMANUEL FERREIRA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GROBLER, JOHANNES STEPHANUS

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991224

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT PT