Global Patent Index - EP 1015722 A1

EP 1015722 A1 2000-07-05 - RATCHETING PAWL LATCH

Title (en)

RATCHETING PAWL LATCH

Title (de)

RIEGEL MIT RATSCHENVERSCHLUSS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE A ENCLIQUETAGE

Publication

EP 1015722 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98946958 A

Priority

  • US 9818990 W
  • US 92826697 A
  • US 5080698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9913189A1] A pawl latch assembly (10) with a spring locking member (53) having its own internal spring force for enabling a force from a handle (11) of the assembly to be transmitted to a pawl (28) to engage or disengage a keeper member (100) for opening and closing of the latch, and further having a lock (23) for securing the latch against unauthorized opening.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05C 3/16 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01); E05C 3/24 (2006.01); E05B 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 83/30 (2013.01); E05B 85/10 (2013.01); E05B 85/18 (2013.01); E05C 3/24 (2013.01); E05B 13/101 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9913189 A1 19990318; AU 9385598 A 19990329; BR 9815631 A 20010828; CA 2303114 A1 19990318; EP 1015722 A1 20000705; EP 1015722 A4 20071114; JP 2001515982 A 20010925; TW 419562 B 20010121

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20160216

2010-11-17 [R17C] DATE OF DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R17C

- Effective date: 20080917

2008-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20080917

2007-11-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20071011

2007-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: E05B 65/12 20060101AFI20071006BHEP

2007-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: E05B 65/20 20060101ALI20071006BHEP

2007-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: E05C 3/24 20060101ALI20071006BHEP

2007-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: E05B 13/10 20060101ALN20071006BHEP

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ANTONUCCI, JEFFREY L., 7 BEARCROFT AVENUE

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ULISSE, RALPH C., APARTMENT P-305

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PINKOW, CHRISTOPHER, J.

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT