Global Patent Index - EP 1015724 A1

EP 1015724 A1 2000-07-05 - THREE-PIECE METAL DOOR CASE

Title (en)

THREE-PIECE METAL DOOR CASE

Title (de)

DREITEILIGE TÜRZARGE AUS STAHL

Title (fr)

CHASSIS DE PORTE EN ACIER EN TROIS PARTIES

Publication

EP 1015724 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98951429 A

Priority

  • DE 29718054 U
  • EP 9805926 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9915751A1] The invention relates to a three-piece expandable metal door case consisting of centrally connected vertical (13) and horizontal (14) metre cut frame parts for receiving a standard door leaf with an edged U-shaped case surface (11) and an upright case seam (5) extending from an opening in a wall, whereby the fastening of the case onto the wall opening profile results by means of opposite angles (22) which serve as compression-proof back feeding, are arranged in an elongation manner of the case seam (5) and are situated in the inner area of the case surface (11) without the need to mimic the profile of the wall opening. Innerlying, tight fitting metal sheets are arranged as torsional fixing centering for the case parts and overlap up to the metre cut edge of said case parts. Said metal sheets construct a shadow joint after assembly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/12; E06B 1/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/34 (2006.01); E06B 1/62 (2006.01); E06B 3/988 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/62 (2013.01); E06B 1/347 (2013.01); E06B 3/9885 (2013.01); E06B 2001/622 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9915751A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29718054 U1 19971211; EP 1015724 A1 20000705; EP 1015724 B1 20020403; WO 9915751 A1 19990401

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2003-10-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031029

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030106

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803652 20020508

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001204

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE