Global Patent Index - EP 1015727 A1

EP 1015727 A1 2000-07-05 - DRILLING TOOL

Title (en)

DRILLING TOOL

Title (de)

BOHRWERKZEUG

Title (fr)

OUTIL DE PER AGE

Publication

EP 1015727 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98933556 A

Priority

  • DE 9801376 W
  • DE 19722519 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19722519A1] The invention relates to a drilling tool, especially a rock drill, comprising a drill head, a clamping stem and a helical stem situated in-between. The aim of the invention is to provide an economical drilling tool. To this end, the base element is a polygonal section which is provided with a helical cutting groove in the area of the helical stem.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 10/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/445 (2013.01); Y10T 408/9097 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854435A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19722519 A1 19981203; CN 1094168 C 20021113; CN 1257562 A 20000621; DK 1015727 T3 20020916; EP 1015727 A1 20000705; EP 1015727 B1 20020605; US 6213232 B1 20010410; WO 9854435 A1 19981203

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59804344

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-03-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-02-27 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050515

2005-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050515

2004-05-26 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040526

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040423

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-11-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021021

2002-10-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804344 20020711

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011115

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991008

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT