Global Patent Index - EP 1015747 A1

EP 1015747 A1 2000-07-05 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REGULATING A GAS FLOW BY MEANS OF A THROTTLE VALVE IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REGULATING A GAS FLOW BY MEANS OF A THROTTLE VALVE IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND EINE VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINES GASFLUSSES ÜBER EIN DROSSELVENTIL IN EINEM VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR REGULER UN FLUX DE GAZ PAR L'INTERMEDIAIRE D'UN PAPILLON DANS UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1015747 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98946235 A

Priority

  • DE 9801937 W
  • DE 19740918 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6422202B1] A method and a device for controlling a gas flow over a throttle valve in an internal combustion engine. The method and device can be used in particular in internal combustion engines in motor vehicles and allow for fast and accurate control of a gas flow while minimizing apparatus and control costs. A method is provided for controlling a gas flow over a throttle valve in a combustion over the throttle valve and the actual gas flow; and taking into account the determined difference when calculating the throttle setting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14; F02D 41/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 11/10 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 11/105 (2013.01); F02D 41/1401 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0402 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914475A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

US 6422202 B1 20020723; CN 1096552 C 20021218; CN 1270657 A 20001018; EP 1015747 A1 20000705; EP 1015747 B1 20011024; JP 2001516839 A 20011002; WO 9914475 A1 19990325

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59801892

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-10 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59801892

- Effective date: 20140224

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100711

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090730

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-10-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801892 20011129

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT