Global Patent Index - EP 1015754 B1

EP 1015754 B1 2003-06-04 - FLANGE FOR FUEL DELIVERY MODULE AND FUEL DELIVERY MODULE

Title (en)

FLANGE FOR FUEL DELIVERY MODULE AND FUEL DELIVERY MODULE

Title (de)

FLANSCH EINES KRAFTSTOFF-FÖRDERMODULS UND KRAFTSTOFF-FÖRDERMODUL

Title (fr)

BRIDE D'UN MODULE DE REFOULEMENT DE CARBURANT, ET MODULE DE REFOULEMENT DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1015754 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99922051 A

Priority

  • DE 9900807 W
  • DE 19813204 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19813204A1] The present invention relates to a flange for a fuel delivery module used for connecting a tank to the fuel supply line of an engine. The module comprises a pressure controller for adjusting the pressure in the fuel supply line and at least one connector to an outer electric potential so that the flange can prevent the occurrence of electrostatic loads at the pressure controller. This invention is characterised in that a portion at least of the flange is made of a material with low electrical conductivity so that the connector is connected in conductive manner to the pressure controller through said material with low electrical conductivity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 15/01 (2006.01); F02M 37/10 (2006.01); F02M 37/22 (2006.01); F02M 37/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/22 (2013.01); F02M 37/106 (2013.01); F02M 2037/082 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19813204 A1 19990930; EP 1015754 A2 20000705; EP 1015754 B1 20030604; JP 2002500721 A 20020108; JP 4243357 B2 20090325; US 6129074 A 20001010; WO 9949206 A2 19990930; WO 9949206 A3 20000420

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050322

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905825 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991227

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT