Global Patent Index - EP 1015761 B1

EP 1015761 B1 2002-09-11 - IMPROVEMENTS IN AND RELATING TO HYDRAULIC PUMPS AND MOTORS

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS IN AND RELATING TO HYDRAULIC PUMPS AND MOTORS

Title (de)

VERBESSERUNG IN UND AN HYDRAULISCHEN PUMPEN UND MOTOREN

Title (fr)

AMELIORATIONS DE MOTEURS ET DE POMPES HYDRAULIQUES

Publication

EP 1015761 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98908221 A

Priority

  • GB 9800655 W
  • GB 9704678 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9839568A1] A piston assembly for an axial displacement pump or motor comprises a piston (15) having at one end a ball shaped piston foot (16) and a slipper (41). The rear end of which defines a piston ball seat (42) in which the ball shaped piston foot (16) is received. A slipper pad (44) defines an annular, centrally located recess or pocket at the front end of the slipper (41). The slipper pad (44) comprises an annular ring (44) of polymer material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/12 (2006.01); F04B 53/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/124 (2013.01); F05C 2225/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9839568 A1 19980911; AU 6630298 A 19980922; AU 719300 B2 20000504; CA 2282424 A1 19980911; DE 69807903 D1 20021017; DE 69807903 T2 20030528; DK 1015761 T3 20021118; EP 1015761 A1 20000705; EP 1015761 B1 20020911; GB 9704678 D0 19970423; JP 2001513865 A 20010904; ZA 9801899 B 20000627

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050303

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GENERAL SIGNAL UK LTD

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040304

2004-03-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040303

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-05-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030522

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030327

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-18 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030318

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030313

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030310

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030306

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-11-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807903 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-09-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENERAL SIGNAL UK LIMITED

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990816

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE