Global Patent Index - EP 1015813 A1

EP 1015813 A1 2000-07-05 - SOLID FUEL FIRED BOILER PLANT AND FURNACE UNIT AND FLUE GAS UNIT FOR USE IN SUCH A BOILER PLANT

Title (en)

SOLID FUEL FIRED BOILER PLANT AND FURNACE UNIT AND FLUE GAS UNIT FOR USE IN SUCH A BOILER PLANT

Title (de)

MIT FESTEN BRENNSTOFFEN GEFEUERTE KESSELANLAGE UND FEUERUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND RAUCHGASEINRICHTUNG FÜR VERWENDUNG IN SOLCHER ANLAGE

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION DE CHAUDIERE A COMBUSTIBLE SOLIDE ET UNITES DE CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION ET DE GAZ DE COMBUSTION UTILISEES DANS CETTE INSTALLATION

Publication

EP 1015813 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97943801 A

Priority

  • DK 9700456 W
  • DK 115596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9817946A1] The invention relates to a solid fuel boiler plant comprising a combustion section (5) and a flue gas section (6). The invention further relates to a furnace unit and a flue gas unit. The combustion section (5) and the flue gas section (6) have a first lateral wall (1, 11), a second lateral wall (2, 12), a third lateral wall (3, 13) and a fourth lateral wall (4, 14). The lateral walls (1, 2, 3, 4, 11, 12, 13, 14) are formed by pipings (2) with a heat transmission medium, preferably water/steam, inside the pipes (22). The second lateral walls (2, 12) of the combustion section (5) and the flue gas section (6), respectively, coincide. The second lateral wall (2, 12) extends in parallel with a substantial flow direction of the flue gas through the combustion section (5) and the flue gas section (6), respectively, and forms a shelter wall between the combustion section (5) and the flue gas section (6). In a preferred embodiment the combustion section (5) is provided with a lining (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22B 21/34; F22B 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F22B 21/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F22B 21/343 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9817946A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9817946 A1 19980430; AT 216475 T 20020515; AU 4551497 A 19980515; BR 9712331 A 19990831; CZ 297187 B6 20060913; CZ 9901365 A3 20011114; DE 69712112 D1 20020523; DE 69712112 T2 20021205; DK 1015813 T3 20020812; EP 1015813 A1 20000705; EP 1015813 B1 20020417; ES 2178007 T3 20021216; PL 186730 B1 20040227; PL 332731 A1 19991011

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161004

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-08-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-06-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021017

2003-04-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030120

2002-12-30 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178007 T3

2002-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-10-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021017

2002-10-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021017

2002-10-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-08-12 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-07-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69712112 20020523

2002-05-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19990429

2002-04-17 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-04-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-04-17 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-04-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 216475 T 20020515

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990429

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19990429