Global patent index - EP 1015820 A1

EP 1015820 A1 2000-07-05 - DEVICE FOR CLOSING A FURNACE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CLOSING A FURNACE

Title (de)

FEUERRAUMVERSCHLIESSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE DE FOYER

Publication

EP 1015820 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98933347 A

Priority

  • AT 9800176 W
  • AT 45497 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9905456A1] The invention relates to a device for closing a furnace (1) in a heating installation (2), especially for a charging door (3) pertaining to a heating fireplace (4) or any type of oven, comprising an anchoring frame (5), a door (7) which can pivot by means of a pivoting device, and a locking device. A regulating device (20) enabling relative movement between the doors (7) and the anchoring frame (5) is arranged between the door (7) and the anchoring frame (5), especially between the pivoting device (20) and the anchoring frame (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24B 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24B 13/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9905456A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9905456 A1 19990204; AT 204976 T 20010915; AU 8323398 A 19990216; DE 59801342 D1 20011004; EP 1015820 A1 20000705; EP 1015820 B1 20010829

INPADOC legal status

2013-05-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59801342

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100720

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2003-07-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030728

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-08-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ABP PATENTMARKETING GMBH

2001-10-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Free Format Text: AMBIO INNOVATIONS- UND VERTRIEBS GMBH,RINGWEG 30,5400 HALLEIN (AT) TRANSFER- AMBIO INNOVATIONS- UND VERTRIEBS GMBH,JOSEF-MAYBURGER-KAI 114,5020 SALZBURG (AT)

2001-10-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801342

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-10-04

2001-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010829

2001-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010829

2001-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 204976

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000121

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI