Global Patent Index - EP 1015830 B1

EP 1015830 B1 2001-12-12 - DRYING FRAME FOR PLASTIC ARTICLES ESPECIALLY BRICKS

Title (en)

DRYING FRAME FOR PLASTIC ARTICLES ESPECIALLY BRICKS

Title (de)

TROCKENRAHMEN FÜR SICH IM PLASTISCHEN ZUSTAND BEFINDLICHE GEGENSTÄNDE, INSBESONDERE FÜR ZIEGEL

Title (fr)

CADRE DE SECHAGE DESTINE A DES OBJETS, NOTAMMENT DES BRIQUES, A L'ETAT PLASTIQUE

Publication

EP 1015830 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98954141 A

Priority

  • DE 9802642 W
  • DE 19740994 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19740994A1] The drying frame (20) takes objects in a plastic state for placing in a drying chamber. It has individual resting points (A, B, C, D) set out on it in accordance with the shape of the object. These resting points can be adjusted individually and simultaneously to the shape of the object and can be locked in their final position. For this purpose, the frame has setting rods (12-15), a common clamping connection (18, 18') and a locking and opening device (22).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 25/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 25/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 25/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19740994 A1 19990318; DE 19740994 C2 20011031; CZ 20000973 A3 20010711; CZ 293466 B6 20040512; EP 1015830 A1 20000705; EP 1015830 B1 20011212; ES 2169932 T3 20020716; PL 188044 B1 20041130; PL 339521 A1 20001218; WO 9914541 A1 19990325

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050908

2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060401

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2006-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-09-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050908

2005-09-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050907

2004-11-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041126

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040923

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040917

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040917

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169932 T3

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802468 20020124

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT NL

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010410

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000312

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT NL