Global Patent Index - EP 1015835 A1

EP 1015835 A1 2000-07-05 - CONDENSER FOR HEAT EXCHANGER SYSTEMS

Title (en)

CONDENSER FOR HEAT EXCHANGER SYSTEMS

Title (de)

KONDENSATOR FÜR WÄRMEAUSTAUSCHSYSTEME

Title (fr)

CONDENSATEUR POUR SYSTEMES D'ECHANGE THERMIQUE

Publication

EP 1015835 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98929873 A

Priority

KR 9800158 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9966281A1] A condenser for heat exchanger systems, capable of reducing a compressed refrigerant from a vapor phase to a liquid phase, is disclosed. The condenser has a condensing tube connected to a refrigerant tube located between a compressor and a capillary tube in order to allow a refrigerant in a heat exchanger system to pass through the condensing tube. Also, a liquid tube is integrally formed on a side wall of the condensing tube by an extrusion process. In addition, a radiating pipe, having a long zigzag shape, is mounted to the liquid tube in such a manner that both ends of the liquid tube are connected to a liquid supplying inlet and a drain outlet of the radiating pipe, respectively. Thus, a condensing medium in the radiating pipe is effectively circulated through the radiating pipe and the liquid tube.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 1/14; F25B 39/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 39/04 (2006.01); F28D 7/00 (2006.01); F28F 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 7/0008 (2013.01); F25B 39/04 (2013.01); F28F 1/16 (2013.01); F28D 2021/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966281A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9966281 A1 19991223; AU 7938998 A 20000105; CN 1103434 C 20030319; CN 1266482 A 20000913; DE 69818696 D1 20031106; DE 69818696 T2 20040805; EP 1015835 A1 20000705; EP 1015835 B1 20031001; JP 2002518660 A 20020625; JP 3333500 B2 20021015

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69818696

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120103

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040702

2003-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69818696

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020311

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000215

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE