Global Patent Index - EP 1015973 A4

EP 1015973 A4 2002-09-25 - LOG BASED DATA ARCHITECTURE FOR A TRANSACTIONAL MESSAGE QUEUING SYSTEM

Title (en)

LOG BASED DATA ARCHITECTURE FOR A TRANSACTIONAL MESSAGE QUEUING SYSTEM

Title (de)

AUF LOGDATEN BASIERTE ARCHITEKTUR FÜR EIN TRANSAKTIONELLES NACHRICHTENWARTESCHLANGENSYSTEM

Title (fr)

ARCHITECTURE DE DONNEES A JOURNALISATION POUR SYSTEME TRANSACTIONNEL DE GESTION DE FILES D'ATTENTE DE MESSAGES

Publication

EP 1015973 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97946642 A

Priority

  • US 9720561 W
  • US 3090596 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9821654A1] A message queuing system is provided that saves and stores messages and their state in an efficient single file on a single disk to enable rapid recovery from server failures. The single disk, single file storage system into which messages and their states are stored eliminates writes to three different disks, the data disk, the index structure disk and the log disk. The single disk, single file storage is made possible by clustering all information together in a contiguous space on the same disk. The result is that all writes are contained in one sweeping motion of the write head in which the write head moves only in one direction and only once to find the area where it needs to start writing messages and their states are stored. In order to keep track of the clustered information, a unique Queue Entry Map Table (100) is used which includes control information (100), message blocks (102) and log records (104) in conjunction with single file disk storage that allows the write head never to have to back-up to traverse saved data when writing new records. The system also permits locating damaged files without the requirement of scanning entire log files.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 11/00; G06F 12/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 12/00 (2006.01); G06F 9/46 (2006.01); G06F 9/54 (2006.01); G06F 15/16 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); G06F 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 69/22 (2013.01); G06F 11/1471 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] EP 0618534 A2 19941005 - IBM [US]
  • [A] DE 4303062 A1 19930805 - DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]
  • [A] EP 0623877 A2 19941109 - IBM [US]
  • [YA] GRAY, JIM; REUTER, ANDREAS: "Transaction Processing: Concepts and Techniques", 1993, MORGAN KAUFMANN, SAN MATEO, CALIFORNIA, XP002207245
  • [Y] "SHARED MEMORY-BASED PROTOCOL FOR TRANSACTION RECOVERY IN DISTRIBUTED DB/DC SYSTEMS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, vol. 29, no. 12, 1 May 1987 (1987-05-01), pages 5493 - 5495, XP000714423, ISSN: 0018-8689
  • See also references of WO 9821654A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9821654 A1 19980522; AU 5177198 A 19980603; EP 1015973 A1 20000705; EP 1015973 A4 20020925; JP 2001502455 A 20010220; JP 4280306 B2 20090617

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040420

2002-09-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990614

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE