Global Patent Index - EP 1016071 A1

EP 1016071 A1 2000-07-05 - METHOD FOR DETECTING SPEECH ACTIVITY

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DETECTING SPEECH ACTIVITY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR SPRACHDETEKTION

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DETECTION D'ACTIVITE VOCALE

Publication

EP 1016071 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98943998 A

Priority

  • FR 9801979 W
  • FR 9711640 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2768544A1] Analyzing variations in energy of signal so as to detect degree of vocal activity within signal

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 25/78 (2013.01); G10L 25/93 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 25/78 (2013.01); G10L 2025/932 (2013.01); G10L 2025/935 (2013.01); G10L 2025/937 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914737A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FI GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2768544 A1 19990319; FR 2768544 B1 19991119; AU 9168898 A 19990405; CA 2304012 A1 19990325; DE 69803202 D1 20020221; DE 69803202 T2 20020829; EP 1016071 A1 20000705; EP 1016071 B1 20020116; US 6658380 B1 20031202; WO 9914737 A1 19990325

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060916

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060916

2005-08-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050817

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2003-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030930

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-01-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-07-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NORTEL NETWORKS FRANCE

2002-07-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EADS DEFENCE AND SECURITY NETWORKS

2002-05-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-04-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020416

2002-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803202 20020221

2002-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI GB LI SE

2002-01-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020116

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MATRA NORTEL COMMUNICATIONS

2001-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EADS DEFENCE AND SECURITY NETWORKS

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 10L 11/02 A, 7G 10L 11/06 B

2000-11-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING SPEECH ACTIVITY

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI GB LI SE