Global patent index - EP 1016072 A1

EP 1016072 A1 2000-07-05 - METHOD FOR SUPPRESSING NOISE IN A DIGITAL SPEECH SIGNAL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR SUPPRESSING NOISE IN A DIGITAL SPEECH SIGNAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR RAUSCHUNTERDRÜCKUNG EINES DIGITALEN SPRACHSIGNALS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DEBRUITAGE D'UN SIGNAL DE PAROLE NUMERIQUE

Publication

EP 1016072 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98943999 A

Priority

  • FR 9801980 W
  • FR 9711643 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2768547A1] The speech signal is divided into spectral component and estimated noise signals subtracted to provide noise-reduced output. The procedure comprises a spectral subtraction including a first subtraction stage in which note is taken of increased estimations (Bn,i) of spectral noise components. This allows production of spectral component (S2n,f) of a first noise-reduced signal. The process further includes the calculation of a masking curve (Mn,q) by applying an auditory perception model w.r.t. the spectral components of the first noise-reduced signal. A second subtraction stage starts with each spectral component of the speech signal in the frame. From each is subtracted a quantity which is dependent on parameters including a difference between the increased estimation of the spectral component corresponding to the noise and the calculated masking curve. The result of this is subject to a transformation into the time domain in order to construct a noise reduced speech signal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); G10L 21/0232 (2013.01); G10L 21/0264 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); G10L 21/0232 (2013.01); G10L 21/0264 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914738A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2768547 A1 19990319; FR 2768547 B1 19991119; AU 9168998 A 19990405; CA 2304571 A1 19990325; DE 69803203 D1 20020221; DE 69803203 T2 20020829; EP 1016072 A1 20000705; EP 1016072 B1 20020116; US 6477489 B1 20021105; WO 9914738 A1 19990325

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050817

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060916

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060916

2005-09-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050902

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050817

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2003-11-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031127

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-17 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2003-10-17 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2003-01-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-07-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NORTEL NETWORKS FRANCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020407

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69803203

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-21

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 10L 21/02 A

2001-04-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPRESSING NOISE IN A DIGITAL SPEECH SIGNAL

2001-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 10L 21/02 A

2001-04-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPRESSING NOISE IN A DIGITAL SPEECH SIGNAL

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB