Global Patent Index - EP 1016073 A1

EP 1016073 A1 2000-07-05 - METHOD FOR SUPPRESSING NOISE IN A DIGITAL SPEECH SIGNAL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR SUPPRESSING NOISE IN A DIGITAL SPEECH SIGNAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR RAUSCHUNTERDRÜCKUNG EINES DIGITALEN SPRACHSIGNALS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DEBRUITAGE D'UN SIGNAL DE PAROLE NUMERIQUE

Publication

EP 1016073 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98944000 A

Priority

  • FR 9801981 W
  • FR 9711642 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2768546A1] Estimating spectral component corresponding to noise and tonal frequency then applying transformation to the temporal area of spectral subtraction so as to form resultant signal performing harmonic analysis of signal to estimate tonal frequency

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 15/20 (2006.01); G10L 15/02 (2006.01); G10L 21/02 (2013.01); G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); H04B 3/20 (2006.01); G10L 21/0232 (2013.01); G10L 21/0264 (2013.01); G10L 25/90 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); G10L 21/0364 (2013.01); G10L 21/0232 (2013.01); G10L 21/0264 (2013.01); G10L 25/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914739A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2768546 A1 19990319; FR 2768546 B1 20000721; AU 9169098 A 19990405; BR 9812655 A 20000822; CA 2304015 A1 19990325; CN 1276896 A 20001213; DE 69804329 D1 20020425; DE 69804329 T2 20021114; EP 1016073 A1 20000705; EP 1016073 B1 20020320; ES 2174484 T3 20021101; JP 2001516902 A 20011002; WO 9914739 A1 19990325

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050817

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060916

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060916

2005-09-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-09-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050902

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050817

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-10-17 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2003-10-17 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030930

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174484 T3

2002-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-08-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020826

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-07-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NORTEL NETWORKS FRANCE

2002-07-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EADS DEFENCE AND SECURITY NETWORKS

2002-06-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-06-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69804329 20020425

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2002-03-20 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MATRA NORTEL COMMUNICATIONS

2002-03-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EADS DEFENCE AND SECURITY NETWORKS

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 10L 21/02 A

2001-04-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPRESSING NOISE IN A DIGITAL SPEECH SIGNAL

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-07-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE