Global Patent Index - EP 1016105 A1

EP 1016105 A1 2000-07-05 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING BUNDLES OF SHEET METAL LAMINATES FOR MAGNETIC CORES

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING BUNDLES OF SHEET METAL LAMINATES FOR MAGNETIC CORES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AUS BLECHLAMELLEN BESTEHENDEN PAKETEN FÜR MAGNETKERNE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION DE PAQUETS FORMES DE LAMES DE TOLES POUR NOYAUX MAGNETIQUES

Publication

EP 1016105 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98955324 A

Priority

  • DE 9802723 W
  • DE 19741364 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9916092A1] The present invention relates to a method that uses the so-called punching bundle-assembling technique for producing bundles of sheet iron having an iron core with a circular or oval cross-section. To this end, the laminates are punched from a strip while forming recesses on one side and protrusions on the other, wherein the protrusions are located opposite the recesses and conform to their shape. The protrusions are pressed into the recesses so as to form at least two circular warts when assembling each bundle. In each bundle, one laminate used as a separation laminate is formed with cylindrical holes instead of recesses for engaging the warts of adjacent laminates. The laminates punched from the strip exhibit different outer profiles and particularly different widths, and said laminates are attached together so as to form a bundle having an iron core with an at least partially circular cross-section. The bundle of sheet iron further exhibits stepped edges.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 41/02; H01F 27/245

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/245 (2006.01); H01F 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 41/0233 (2013.01); H01F 27/245 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49078 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5138 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5143 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9916092A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9916092 A1 19990401; CA 2303898 A1 19990401; CA 2303898 C 20030708; DE 19741364 A1 19990422; DE 19741364 C2 20000525; DE 59814052 D1 20070816; EP 1016105 A1 20000705; EP 1016105 B1 20070704; HU 0003508 A2 20010228; HU 0003508 A3 20010628; JP 2001517867 A 20011009; KR 100367941 B1 20030114; US 6588093 B1 20030708

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120914

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120914

2013-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-07-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59814052

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120914

2013-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111005

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110923

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100923

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-06-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080407

2007-12-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-09-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2007-08-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070803

2007-08-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59814052 P 20070816

2007-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2007-07-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050502

2004-11-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VACUUMSCHMELZE GMBH

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI