Global Patent Index - EP 1016106 A1

EP 1016106 A1 2000-07-05 - CERAMIC MULTILAYER PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARDS WITH EMBEDDED PASSIVE COMPONENTS

Title (en)

CERAMIC MULTILAYER PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARDS WITH EMBEDDED PASSIVE COMPONENTS

Title (de)

KERAMISCHE MEHRSCHICHTIGE GEDRUCKTE SCHALTUNGSPLATTEN MIT EINGEBETTETEN PASSIVEN BAUTEILEN

Title (fr)

PLAQUETTES DE CIRCUITS IMPRIMES EN CERAMIQUE MULTICOUCHE A COMPOSANTS PASSIFS ENCASTRES

Publication

EP 1016106 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98910019 A

Priority

  • US 9803270 W
  • US 81215197 A
  • US 81217297 A
  • US 81283297 A
  • US 3174598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9839784A1] Passive components such as capacitors, resistors, and RF filters can be made by screen printing suitable inks onto green tapes, completed with conductive layers (14, 15) below and above the component ink layers. The resultant green tape stack is then fired to form embedded capacitors. By laminating the green tape stack onto metal support board substrate, shrinkage in the x and y dimensions is limited and the components can maintain close tolerances. When many green tape layers are to be stacked, improved shrinkage is obtained when green tapes having a moderate amount of oxide fillers, e.g., less than about 15 % by weight of the green tape composition, are interleaved with green tape having higher amounts, e.g., above 25 % by weight, of oxide fillers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01G 4/06; H01G 4/20; H01G 4/228; H01G 4/10; H01C 10/10; H01C 10/00; H01C 7/10; H01L 27/108; H01L 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05K 3/46 (2006.01); H01C 7/00 (2006.01); H01C 13/02 (2006.01); H01C 17/065 (2006.01); H01C 17/30 (2006.01); H01G 4/12 (2006.01); H01G 4/33 (2006.01); H01G 4/40 (2006.01); H01L 23/12 (2006.01); H01L 23/64 (2006.01); H05K 1/03 (2006.01); H05K 1/05 (2006.01); H05K 1/16 (2006.01); H01L 23/14 (2006.01); H05K 1/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05K 1/167 (2013.01); C03C 8/14 (2013.01); C03C 8/22 (2013.01); H01C 7/003 (2013.01); H01C 13/02 (2013.01); H01C 17/30 (2013.01); H01L 23/64 (2013.01); H05K 1/162 (2013.01); H01L 24/48 (2013.01); H01L 2224/48091 (2013.01); H01L 2224/48227 (2013.01); H01L 2924/00014 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01012 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01019 (2013.01); H01L 2924/0102 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01025 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01039 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01046 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01077 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01079 (2013.01); H01L 2924/09701 (2013.01); H01L 2924/19041 (2013.01); H05K 1/0306 (2013.01); H05K 1/092 (2013.01); H05K 3/0061 (2013.01); H05K 3/4611 (2013.01); H05K 3/4629 (2013.01); H05K 3/4688 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. H01L 2224/48091 + H01L 2924/00014
  2. H01L 2924/00014 + H01L 2224/45015 + H01L 2924/207
  3. H01L 2924/00014 + H01L 2224/45099
  4. H01L 2924/00014 + H01L 2224/05599
  5. H01L 2924/00014 + H01L 2224/85399

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9839784 A1 19980911; EP 1016106 A1 20000705; EP 1016106 A4 20071212; JP 2002505805 A 20020219; JP 2006165585 A 20060622; JP 3944791 B2 20070718; KR 100516043 B1 20050926; KR 100546471 B1 20060126; KR 20000075996 A 20001226; KR 20050043991 A 20050511; TW 405330 B 20000911

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081209

2008-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080527

2007-12-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20071108

2007-09-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H05K 3/46 20060101AFI20070813BHEP

2007-09-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H05K 1/16 20060101ALI20070813BHEP

2007-09-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01G 4/12 20060101ALI20070813BHEP

2007-09-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01G 4/33 20060101ALI20070813BHEP

2007-09-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01C 17/065 20060101ALI20070813BHEP

2007-09-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H05K 1/05 20060101ALN20070813BHEP

2007-09-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 23/14 20060101ALN20070813BHEP

2007-09-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 23/64 20060101ALN20070813BHEP

2007-09-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01C 7/00 20060101ALN20070813BHEP

2003-07-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LAMINA CERAMICS, INC.

2003-07-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SHARP CORPORATION

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990917

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB