Global Patent Index - EP 1016112 A1

EP 1016112 A1 2000-07-05 - DEVICE FOR GENERATING AUXILIARY ENERGY FOR A TRIGGER SYSTEM, AND OPERATING MODE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR GENERATING AUXILIARY ENERGY FOR A TRIGGER SYSTEM, AND OPERATING MODE

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG ZUR GEWINNUNG EINER HILFSENERGIE FÜR EIN AUSLÖSESYSTEM UND VERWENDUNG DERSELBEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR OBTENIR UNE ENERGIE AUXILIAIRE POUR UN SYSTEME DE DECLENCHEMENT, ET MODE D'EMPLOI

Publication

EP 1016112 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98954194 A

Priority

  • DE 9802774 W
  • DE 19741659 A
  • DE 19843245 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9914779A1] The invention relates to a device designed to generate auxiliary energy intended for operating the trigger mechanism of a low voltage circuit-breaker. Said device presents a closing control in a mobile interrupter contact (1) as well as a generator (23) which is activated as a result of the interrupter contact closing (1). The generator (23), whether piezolelectric or otherwise, can be designed as an ending stop (33), which is used as a limit switch for the actuating device (7) when closing the interrupter contact (1). The output value appearing at the generator (23) is used, when power is supplied after a short circuit, as a signal for triggering the immediate activation of the voltage circuit-breaker.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/10 (2006.01); H01H 71/12 (2006.01); H02N 2/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/10 (2013.01); H01H 71/127 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914779A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9914779 A1 19990325; DE 19843245 A1 19990812; EP 1016112 A1 20000705; EP 1016112 B1 20011212

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070914

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050906

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060914

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060914

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051121

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050912

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050906

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802469

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-24

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010504

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT