Global patent index - EP 1016165 A1

EP 1016165 A1 2000-07-05 - RADIATING CABLE

Title (en)

RADIATING CABLE

Title (de)

STRAHLENDES KABEL

Title (fr)

CABLE RAYONNANT

Publication

EP 1016165 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98954558 A

Priority

  • FR 9802406 W
  • FR 9715135 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2771859A1] The invention concerns a radiating cable comprising N first and N second insulated conducting wires (F1, F3; F2, F4 or F1, F2; F3, F4) cabled together in a maintaining sheath (G). At the first ends (E11-E14), the first wires (F1, F3) are connected to the external conductor (CE) of a coaxial supply cable (CX), and the second wires (F2, F4) are connected to the internal conductor (CI) of the coaxial cable. The second ends (E21-E24) of the first and second wires are respectively connected to the terminals of an adapted load (CH). Said radiating cable is less expensive than the standard radiating cable with slots and can be installed in buildings to operate up to about 3 GHz.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 13/20; H01B 13/20; H04B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 13/22 (2006.01); H01Q 13/20 (2006.01); H04B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 13/203 (2013.01); H01Q 13/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928992A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2771859 A1 19990604; FR 2771859 B1 19991231; AU 1162299 A 19990616; BR 9815417 A 20001024; DE 69804330 D1 20020425; DE 69804330 T2 20021024; EP 1016165 A1 20000705; EP 1016165 B1 20020320; ES 2171047 T3 20020816; JP 2001525625 A 20011211; WO 9928992 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-09-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69804330

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121112

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111112

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20111112

2012-01-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69804330

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MUELLER, JOCHEN, DIPL.-ING., DE

2012-01-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69804330

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: JOCHEN MUELLER, DE

2011-07-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101122

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101118

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081112

2007-02-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2006-12-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2006-10-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2006-07-28 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2006-07-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2006-07-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2171047

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-06-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-06-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020527

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69804330

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-25

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010612

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE