Global Patent Index - EP 1016187 A1

EP 1016187 A1 2000-07-05 - CONDUCTOR FOR HIGH-VOLTAGE WINDINGS AND A ROTATING ELECTRIC MACHINE COMPRISING A WINDING INCLUDING THE CONDUCTOR

Title (en)

CONDUCTOR FOR HIGH-VOLTAGE WINDINGS AND A ROTATING ELECTRIC MACHINE COMPRISING A WINDING INCLUDING THE CONDUCTOR

Title (de)

LEITER FÜR HOCHSPANNUNGSWICKLUNGEN UND ROTIERENDE ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE MIT EINEM SOLCHEN LEITER

Title (fr)

CONDUCTEUR POUR ENROULEMENTS A HAUTE TENSION ET MACHINES ELECTRIQUES TOURNANTES COMPRENANT UN ENROULEMENT CONSTITUE DU CONDUCTEUR

Publication

EP 1016187 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97924478 A

Priority

  • SE 9700902 W
  • SE 9602079 A
  • SE 9602093 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6376775B1] A conductor and a rotating electric high-voltage machine that includes the conductor has a cable configured for high-voltage operation. The cable may be included as a winding for the rotating electric high-voltage machine. The conductor includes a first strand that is clad with an electrically insulating layer, and a second strand that is uninsulated whereas the first strand and the second strand are arranged in two or more layers of strands. The two or more layers of strands are insulated from one another. Furthermore, the first and second layers of the two or more layers of strands are arranged around a central core where the central core is at least one of an air core and a core of another material. The second strand is positioned so as not to be electrically contacting any other uninsulated strand.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02K 3/40; H01B 7/30; H02K 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/00 (2006.01); H01F 3/10 (2006.01); H01F 3/14 (2006.01); H01F 27/28 (2006.01); H01F 27/32 (2006.01); H01F 27/34 (2006.01); H02K 3/14 (2006.01); H02K 3/28 (2006.01); H02K 3/34 (2006.01); H02K 3/40 (2006.01); H02K 3/48 (2006.01); H02K 11/04 (2006.01); H02K 15/00 (2006.01); H02K 15/12 (2006.01); H02K 1/16 (2006.01); H02K 9/19 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/323 (2013.01); H01F 3/10 (2013.01); H01F 3/14 (2013.01); H01F 27/288 (2013.01); H01F 27/34 (2013.01); H02K 3/14 (2013.01); H02K 3/28 (2013.01); H02K 3/34 (2013.01); H02K 3/40 (2013.01); H02K 3/48 (2013.01); H02K 11/046 (2013.01); H02K 15/00 (2013.01); H02K 15/12 (2013.01); H01F 2027/329 (2013.01); H02K 1/165 (2013.01); H02K 9/19 (2013.01); H02K 2203/15 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9745930A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6376775 B1 20020423; AT 250817 T 20031015; AU 2989197 A 19980105; DE 69725181 D1 20031030; EP 1016187 A1 20000705; EP 1016187 B1 20030924; ES 2208904 T3 20040616; JP 2000511338 A 20000829; WO 9745930 A1 19971204

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110528

2013-06-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130605

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110528

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110527

2012-01-10 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-12-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ABB AB

- Free text: ABB AB# #721 83 VAESTERAS (SE) -TRANSFER TO- ABB AB# #721 83 VAESTERAS (SE)

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100510

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100514

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100611

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100512

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040224

2005-03-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-01-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-10-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2208904 T3

2004-05-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040527

2004-05-27 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040527

2004-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-01-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-12-25 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031225

2003-12-24 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031224

2003-12-24 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031224

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69725181 P 20031030

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-09-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-09-24 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-09-24 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-09-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-09-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011213

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981229

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE