Global Patent Index - EP 1016201 A1

EP 1016201 A1 2000-07-05 - ADJUSTABLE VOLTAGE CONVERTER UTILIZING A CHARGE PUMP

Title (en)

ADJUSTABLE VOLTAGE CONVERTER UTILIZING A CHARGE PUMP

Title (de)

REGELBARER SPANNUNGSWANDLER MIT LADUNGSPUMPE

Title (fr)

CONVERTISSEUR DE TENSION REGLABLE UTILISANT UNE POMPE A CHARGE

Publication

EP 1016201 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98921168 A

Priority

  • US 9809728 W
  • US 86505297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5841648A] An adjustable charge pump design employs a variable voltage level means to reduce the charge on the charge pump charging capacitor. The charge pump output is thereby controlled without the use of any secondary pass elements applied to the charge pump output voltage. The variable voltage level means, e.g. a variable resistor, "steals" voltage from the charging capacitor in either an inverting charge pump configuration or a doubling configuration. The voltage converter employing the adjustable charge pump is advantageously applied to providing an adjustable contrast control for an LCD display. Certain intrinsic safety requirements are achievable with the present design thereby making possible a backlit, intrinsically safe LCD display.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02M 3/07; G05F 1/59; H02M 3/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/59 (2006.01); H02M 3/07 (2006.01); H05B 33/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 33/0842 (2013.01); H02M 3/07 (2013.01); H05B 33/0848 (2013.01); H05B 33/0887 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854825A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

US 5841648 A 19981124; AR 012869 A1 20001122; AU 7384198 A 19981230; CN 1134884 C 20040114; CN 1258392 A 20000628; DE 69802207 D1 20011129; DE 69802207 T2 20020418; EP 1016201 A1 20000705; EP 1016201 B1 20011024; HK 1027684 A1 20041112; JP 2002500858 A 20020108; JP 3429009 B2 20030722; MY 120744 A 20051130; WO 9854825 A1 19981203

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-10-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802207 20011129

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991025

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE