Global patent index - EP 1016229 A1

EP 1016229 A1 2000-07-05 - OPTICAL AMPLIFIER WITH GAIN ADJUSTMENT

Title (en)

OPTICAL AMPLIFIER WITH GAIN ADJUSTMENT

Title (de)

OPTISCHER VERSTÄRKER MIT GEWINNREGELUNG

Title (fr)

AMPLIFICATEUR OPTIQUE A REGULATION DE GAIN

Publication

EP 1016229 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98952526 A

Priority

  • DE 9802539 W
  • DE 19740743 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19740743C1] The amplifier includes a damping element (VA) and a coupling element (FK) via which a narrow band signal (LL) is fed back from the output to the input. The amplifier is provided in the form of a ring resonator and gain control is accomplished by the feed back. The amplifier element is connected in series with an optical circulator (OZ) and at least one narrow band reflector (FG) which reflects the narrow band signal. The circulator has a second output connected to the damping element for the narrow band signal, which is fed back to the input of the amplifier element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 10/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01S 3/13 (2006.01); H03G 3/30 (2006.01); H04B 10/291 (2013.01); H04B 10/296 (2013.01); H04J 14/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03G 3/3084 (2013.01); H01S 3/1302 (2013.01); H04B 10/291 (2013.01); H04B 10/296 (2013.01); H04J 14/0221 (2013.01); H04J 14/0227 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914873A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19740743 C1 19990121; AU 1020899 A 19990405; AU 750467 B2 20020718; BR 9812314 A 20000829; CN 1270719 A 20001018; CN 1332519 C 20070815; EP 1016229 A1 20000705; EP 1016229 B1 20020320; HK 1031053 A1 20080314; JP 2001517016 A 20011002; RU 2191478 C2 20021020; WO 9914873 A1 19990325

INPADOC legal status

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140827

2015-05-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150430

2015-05-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59803458

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140827

2015-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140827

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59803458

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-12-31 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: R079

- Ref Document Number: 59803458

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Free Format Text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H04B0010170000

- IPC: H04B0010291000

- Effective date: 20141124

2014-11-24 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: R079

- Ref Document Number: 59803458

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Free Format Text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H04B0010170000

- IPC: H04B0010291000

2014-05-09 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: GC

- Effective date: 20140408

2014-05-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: XIEON NETWORKS S.A.R.L., LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20140408

2014-02-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140130 AND 20140205

2014-01-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20131212 AND 20131218

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130828

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-12-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: XIEON NETWORKS S.A.R.L., LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59803458

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131106

2013-12-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59803458

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

- Effective date: 20131106

2013-12-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59803458

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT ANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB -, DE

- Effective date: 20131106

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130823

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59803458

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-03-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090212 AND 20090218

2008-10-31 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-06-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020527

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803458

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-25

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010403

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000303

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT