Global Patent Index - EP 1016237 A2

EP 1016237 A2 2000-07-05 - ASYMMETRIC SATELLITE-BASED INTERNET SERVICE

Title (en)

ASYMMETRIC SATELLITE-BASED INTERNET SERVICE

Title (de)

ASYMMETRISCHER SATELLITENBASIERTER INTERNET-DIENST

Title (fr)

SERVICE INTERNET UTILISANT DES SATELLITES ASYMETRIQUES

Publication

EP 1016237 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98953193 A

Priority

  • US 9820164 W
  • US 5970997 P
  • US 6542497 P
  • US 8058698 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9916201A2] An asymmetric access satellite-based system having improved features including multicasting, master and slave cache facilities, roaming, and flexible IP packet routing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 7/185 (2006.01); H04L 12/28 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 29/12 (2006.01); H04N 5/00 (2011.01); H04N 7/24 (2011.01); H04L 12/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/2856 (2013.01); H04B 7/18582 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2013.01); H04L 29/12009 (2013.01); H04L 61/00 (2013.01); H04L 12/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9916201 A2 19990401; WO 9916201 A3 19990610; AU 1062599 A 19990412; BR 9814031 A 20020122; EP 1016237 A2 20000705; EP 1016237 A4 20010207; MY 127869 A 20061229

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-02 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1029644

2007-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070310

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031010

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031010

2001-02-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04L 1/00 A, 7H 04B 7/185 B

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE