Global Patent Index - EP 1016319 A1

EP 1016319 A1 2000-07-05 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR CODING A TIME-DISCRETE STEREO SIGNAL

Title (en)

PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR CODING A TIME-DISCRETE STEREO SIGNAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM CODIEREN EINES ZEITDISKRETEN STEREOSIGNALS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR CODER UN SIGNAL STEREO TEMPORELLEMENT DISCRET

Publication

EP 1016319 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98932156 A

Priority

  • DE 19742655 A
  • EP 9803605 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19742655A1] A process for coding a time-discrete stereo signal having a first and a second channel (R, L) makes it possible to scale stereo coding. A monosignal (M) is first formed from the stereo signal, then coded, and the coded monosignal is transmitted in a bit stream. Finally, the coded monosignal is decoded again and stereo information is formed on the basis of the coded/decoded monosignal (M') and of the first and second channels (R, L). This stereo information is coded and also written in the bit stream to yield a bit stream with a completely coded monolayer and a layer with coded stereo information.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04S 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04S 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/24 (2013.01); G10L 19/008 (2013.01); H04S 1/007 (2013.01); G10L 19/0212 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9917587A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19742655 A1 19990422; DE 19742655 C2 19990805; AT 205041 T 20010915; DK 1016319 T3 20011008; EP 1016319 A1 20000705; EP 1016319 B1 20010829; ES 2161059 T3 20011116; US 6629078 B1 20030930; WO 9917587 A1 19990408

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-09-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT;BRENDENWEG 11 POSTFACH 154;9424 RHEINECK (CH)

2004-01-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER ANGEWA

- Free text: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.#LEONRODSTRASSE 54#80636 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.#HANSASTRASSE 27 C#80686 MUENCHEN (DE)

2002-08-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-15 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020615

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2001-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011129

2001-11-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2161059 T3

2001-10-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-10-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801343 20011004

2001-10-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-09-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010829

2001-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 205041 T 20010915

2001-08-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010202

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991116

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE