Global patent index - EP 1016324 A1

EP 1016324 A1 2000-07-05 - MICROWAVE APPLICATOR AND ITS APPLICATION FOR REMOVING CONTAMINATED CONCRETE SURFACE LAYERS

Title (en)

MICROWAVE APPLICATOR AND ITS APPLICATION FOR REMOVING CONTAMINATED CONCRETE SURFACE LAYERS

Title (de)

MIKROWELLENAPPLICATOR UND SEINE VERWENDUNG ZUM EHTFERNEN VON VERSEUCHTEN OBERFLÄCHE VON BETON

Title (fr)

APPLICATEUR DE MICRO-ONDES, ET SON APPLICATION A LA SCARIFICATION SUPERFICIELLE DU BETON CONTAMINE

Publication

EP 1016324 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98904246 A

Priority

  • FR 9800165 W
  • FR 9701102 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2759239A1] The microwaves coming from a guide (5) are focused towards a zone (F2) located on a concrete wall surface (2) for evaporating the free water contained until the concrete is cracked. The applicator is characterised in that it comprises a cylindrical envelope (4) with an elliptical base and a piece (11) arranged at a focal zone (F1) of the envelope, diffusing the incident waves towards the envelope wall where they are reflected towards the focusing zone (F2) at the ellipse second focal point. The invention is particularly useful for dismantling nuclear plants.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 6/74; H05B 6/80

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/72 (2006.01); H05B 6/74 (2006.01); H05B 6/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/701 (2013.01); H05B 6/708 (2013.01); H05B 6/76 (2013.01); Y10S 588/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9834435A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2759239 A1 19980807; FR 2759239 B1 19990305; DE 69813262 D1 20030515; DE 69813262 T2 20040205; EP 1016324 A1 20000705; EP 1016324 B1 20030409; JP 2001511295 A 20010807; US 6157013 A 20001205; WO 9834435 A1 19980806

INPADOC legal status

2005-09-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050129

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050129

2005-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050129

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040112

2004-01-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040126

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990716

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT