Global Patent Index - EP 1016349 A1

EP 1016349 A1 2000-07-05 - Method for the distribution of tobacco components and distributor for a smoking article manufacturing machine

Title (en)

Method for the distribution of tobacco components and distributor for a smoking article manufacturing machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Verteilen von Tabakkomponenten und Verteiler für eine Rauchartikelherstellungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé de distribution des constituants de tabac, et distributeur d'une machine de fabrication de produits à fumer

Publication

EP 1016349 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98811272 A

Priority

EP 98811272 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves introducing the tobacco product in to a distribution channel that is of a generally downward facing configuration. Introduction of an air flux such that the tobacco is transferred around a roller unit and up transfer conveyor system. An Independent claim is included for an apparatus for initiating the described process.

Abstract (fr)

Pour augmenter le rendement d'une machine à fabriquer les produits de l'industrie du tabac, on projette un flux de tabac, contenant des brins, d'une part, et des côtes et des corps étrangers, d'autre part, dans un distributeur (1) contre une paroi (20) qui est munie de profils de creux (22) et saillies (24), disposés côte à côte dans la direction du flux de tabac. Les côtes sont alors alignés parallèlement au flux du tabac. Le distributeur comporte une canalisation (13) dont au moins une paroi (20), à savoir celle contre qui est projeté le flux de tabac, est munie de profils en creux (22) et saillies (24), disposés côte à côte dans la direction du flux de tabac. On peut en plus monter un rouleau rotatif (40), egalement pourvu de ces profils, au bas de ladite paroi. Une machine équipé de ce distributeur présente, en plus d'un rendement accru grâce à un meilleur taux d'enlèvement des côtes, l'avantage d'une réduction sensible des arrêts dus aux bourrages de tabac. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016349 A1 20000705; EP 1016349 B1 20030115; AU 1545000 A 20000724; DE 69810792 D1 20030220; DE 69810792 T2 20031106; ES 2189122 T3 20030701; WO 0040105 A1 20000713

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081230

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081230

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081230

2009-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071114

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071121

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071115

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071214

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20071127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2189122 T3

2003-05-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-02-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810792 P 20030220

2003-02-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2003-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS S.A.

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI