Global Patent Index - EP 1016360 A1

EP 1016360 A1 2000-07-05 - A bed with an articulated matress support

Title (en)

A bed with an articulated matress support

Title (de)

Bett mit gegliederte Untermatratze

Title (fr)

Lit avec sommier articulé

Publication

EP 1016360 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99403248 A

Priority

FR 9816721 A

Abstract (en)

The bed consists of a rigid frame (10) and an articulated mattress base (4) with head (5) and middle (6) sections able to pivot relative to the frame on a fixed member (8), and the foot section (7) hinged to the end of the middle section. The frame is equipped with one mechanism to raise and lower the head section and a second to tilt the middle and foot sections. The second mechanism has a lever (42) pivoted to the frame and acting on the foot section via a slideway (45) and a telescopic arm (51) located between the frame and the end of the foot section, allowing the foot section to be inclined downwards below the horizontal plane of the bed.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un lit (1) ayant un sommier articulé (4), dont la partie tête (5) et la partie médiane (6) sont montées à rotation sur le cadre (10) aux extrémités d'une partie fixe (8), et dont la partie pied (7) est articulée à l'extrémité de la partie médiane (6). Un mécanisme (40) permet d'incliner la partie médiane (6) et la partie pied (7). Ce mécanisme comporte un levier (42) pivotant sur le cadre (10) et agissant sur la partie pied (7) au moyen d'une coulisse, et un bras télescopique (51) interposé entre le cadre (10) et la zone d'extrémité de la partie pied (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 20/04; A47C 20/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/04 (2006.01); A47C 20/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/08 (2013.01); A47C 20/041 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016360 A1 20000705; EP 1016360 B1 20031015; DE 69912083 D1 20031120; DE 69912083 T2 20040708; ES 2209363 T3 20040616; FR 2787975 A1 20000707; FR 2787975 B1 20010323

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131222

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131223

2015-03-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150327

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131222

2014-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69912083

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131222

2014-07-23 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69912083

2014-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *ONIRIS

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121217

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121207

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209363 T3

2004-02-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040128

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69912083 P 20031120

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT NL

2003-10-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020822

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES GB IT NL

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT NL

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI