Global Patent Index - EP 1016361 A3

EP 1016361 A3 2001-04-11 - Pallet placement system

Title (en)

Pallet placement system

Title (de)

Palettenplazierungssystem

Title (fr)

Système pour le placement de palettes

Publication

EP 1016361 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99119851 A

Priority

  • DE 29823120 U
  • DE 29911058 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1016361A2] The system has a horizontal, rectangular palette frame (1) for a pallet, which can be inserted into it and removed from it and an information area carrier (3) mounted on the rear (4) of the pallet frame and extending upwards from the frame. The frame has an upright front wall and side walls between the front wall and rear wall. The height of the information surface carrier may be increased or decreased.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/14 (2006.01); A47F 5/10 (2006.01); A47F 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/142 (2013.01); A47F 5/10 (2013.01); A47F 11/10 (2013.01); A47F 2005/0075 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016361 A2 20000705; EP 1016361 A3 20010411

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030501

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010702

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI