Global Patent Index - EP 1016362 A3

EP 1016362 A3 2001-05-30 - Decorative hook and fabric belt for hanging decorative fabrics

Title (en)

Decorative hook and fabric belt for hanging decorative fabrics

Title (de)

Dekorationshaken mit textilem Band zum Aufhängen von Dekorationsstoffen

Title (fr)

Crochet décoratif et bande de tissu pour suspendre des tissus décoratifs

Publication

EP 1016362 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99124979 A

Priority

DE 19860620 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1016362A2] Two rows of hanger loops are provided on the rear side of the pleating tape (13) sewn onto the top edge of the curtain (3), the loops extending parallel to each other and being vertically aligned. The hook (2) has hook-shaped leaf at one end, having a suitable diameter for hooking it over a standard curtain rod (4) or line, whilst at the other end are one or more pins that can be guided into the loops, so that each pin passes through two vertically aligned loops. Several interspaced hooks are introduced into the loops and then engaged with e.g. the curtain rod.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47H 13/04; A47H 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47H 13/04 (2006.01); A47H 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47H 13/04 (2013.01); A47H 13/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] FR 1224732 A 19600627

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016362 A2 20000705; EP 1016362 A3 20010530; DE 19860620 A1 20000706

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011201

2002-03-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI