Global Patent Index - EP 1016363 A2

EP 1016363 A2 2000-07-05 - Device for undulating, oscillating folding of decorative fabrics

Title (en)

Device for undulating, oscillating folding of decorative fabrics

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum schlangenförmigen, oszillierenden Falten von Dekorationsstoffen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le plissage ondulé, oscillant de tissus de décoration

Publication

EP 1016363 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125980 A

Priority

DE 19860574 A

Abstract (en)

The tape (2) sewn into the rear side of the curtain (1) close to its top edge is provided with a first row of loops (3) for e.g. roller rings or slide fasteners in order to hang it from e.g. a rod or rail, and with a second row of loops (6) beneath the first row, for ball locks (7) that are engaged with individual balls in a ball chain (10). The distance (A) between the balls in the ball locks is less than the distance (B) between two adjacent ball locks, resulting in the pleats.

Abstract (de)

Der Erfindung liegt der Gedanke zugrunde, eine in Stoffzugabe und ästhetischer Gestaltung sehr variable Faltung der Dekorationsbahn in oszillierender Form zu erreichen, welche bei einem beliebigem Aufhängesystem eingesetzt werden kann. Die Faltung wird mittels eines auf der Rückseite der Dekorationsbahn (1) aufgenähten, textilen Bandes (2) erreicht, in dessen Schlaufen (6) Kugelhalter (7) eingehängt werden. In die Kugelhalter (7) werden einzelne Kugeln (9) einer Kugelkette (10) geclipst, deren Abstand (A) kürzer ist, als der Abstand (B) der Kugelhalter (7) auf dem Band (2) zueinander. Dadurch ergibt sich automatisch eine Faltung. Durch Variation von Abstand (B) der Kugelhalter und Abstand (A) der Kugeln (9) der Kugelkette (10) ergeben sich unterschiedliche Stoffzugaben. An den Schlaufen (3) des Bandes können beliebige Aufhängevorrichtungen für beliebige Aufhängesysteme angebracht werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47H 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47H 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47H 13/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016363 A2 20000705; EP 1016363 A3 20010530; DE 19860574 A1 20000706

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-06-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK LI

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010813

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47H 13/16 A, 7A 47H 13/02 B

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK LI

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI