Global Patent Index - EP 1016363 A3

EP 1016363 A3 2001-05-30 - Device for undulating, oscillating folding of decorative fabrics

Title (en)

Device for undulating, oscillating folding of decorative fabrics

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum schlangenförmigen, oszillierenden Falten von Dekorationsstoffen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le plissage ondulé, oscillant de tissus de décoration

Publication

EP 1016363 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99125980 A

Priority

DE 19860574 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1016363A2] The tape (2) sewn into the rear side of the curtain (1) close to its top edge is provided with a first row of loops (3) for e.g. roller rings or slide fasteners in order to hang it from e.g. a rod or rail, and with a second row of loops (6) beneath the first row, for ball locks (7) that are engaged with individual balls in a ball chain (10). The distance (A) between the balls in the ball locks is less than the distance (B) between two adjacent ball locks, resulting in the pleats.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47H 13/16; A47H 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47H 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47H 13/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] FR 2299838 A1 19760903 - CUSO MARIA [ES]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016363 A2 20000705; EP 1016363 A3 20010530; DE 19860574 A1 20000706

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-06-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK LI

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010813

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47H 13/16 A, 7A 47H 13/02 B

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK LI

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI