Global patent index - EP 1016397 A2

EP 1016397 A2 2000-07-05 - Patient transfer device, convertible into a chair

Title (en)

Patient transfer device, convertible into a chair

Title (de)

Patiententransfervorrichtung, die in einen Stuhl umwandelbar ist

Title (fr)

Système de transfert pour patient, modulable en une chaise

Publication

EP 1016397 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99500136 A

Priority

ES 9803286 U

Abstract (en)

Articulated stretcher which can be transformed into a chair, adaptable to beds, comprising a general frame with support overhang arms, being fitted with three bodies making up the back, seat and headrest and with a footrest step all of them articulated one to the other in order to selectively position each function. Each element and arrangement of the different functions of the stretcher, counts on driving and holding elements at the same time which transmit power and movement to the back, armrest, footrest and seat. The whole set is installed by means of a pair of stays fixed onto a rolling sliding base being fitted with a piston which in combination with the stays moves the stretcher in the rising and lowering sense. Preferred figure, number 5<th>. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/00 (2006.01); A61G 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/1019 (2013.01); A61G 5/006 (2013.01); A61G 7/1046 (2013.01); A61G 7/1057 (2013.01); A61G 5/1059 (2013.01); A61G 7/1003 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016397 A2 20000705; EP 1016397 A3 20010228; ES 1042177 U 19990816; ES 1042177 Y 20000101

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030428

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001228

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI