Global Patent Index - EP 1016442 A2

EP 1016442 A2 2000-07-05 - Antifoam compositions containing ultra high molecular weight resins

Title (en)

Antifoam compositions containing ultra high molecular weight resins

Title (de)

Ultrahochmolekulare Harze enthaltende Antischaumzusammensetzungen

Title (fr)

Compositions antimousse contenant des résines d'ultra haut poids moléculaire

Publication

EP 1016442 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99126113 A

Priority

US 22439898 A

Abstract (en)

A foam control composition is disclosed comprising (I) a liquid siloxane component and (II) a finely divided filler having its surface rendered hydrophobic, characterized in that the liquid siloxane component (I) has a viscosity at 25 DEG C. of at least 5,000 mPa.s and is obtained by mixing (1) 100 parts by weight of a polydiorganosiloxane having at least one terminal silanol group and at least 40 Si atoms, (2) 0 - 100 parts by weight of a polydiorganosiloxane having triorganosiloxy end groups and (3) from 0.5 to 10 parts by weight of an ultra high molecular weight organopolysiloxane resin comprising the copolymerized reaction product of (A) a solid MQ resin with Mw less than 100,000 and (B) a substantially linear polydiorganosiloxane linker having hydrolyzable groups bonded to silicon atoms or silicon bonded hydrogen atoms, wherein components (A) and (B), are copolymerized in a weight ratio of (A):(B) typically ranging from 5.6:1 to 44.5:1.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 19/04; C11D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 3/00 (2006.01); B01D 19/04 (2006.01); C08L 83/06 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/373 (2013.01); B01D 19/0404 (2013.01); B01D 19/0409 (2013.01); C11D 3/0026 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B01D 19/0404 + B01D 19/0409

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016442 A2 20000705; EP 1016442 A3 20011205; BR 9906026 A 20001010; JP 2000189710 A 20000711; KR 20000048475 A 20000725

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020917

2002-10-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 01D 19/04 A, 7C 11D 3/00 B, 7C 11D 3/37 B

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI