Global patent index - EP 1016470 A1

EP 1016470 A1 2000-07-05 - Cleaning pistol for pipelines

Title (en)

Cleaning pistol for pipelines

Title (de)

Reinigungspistole für Rohrleitungen

Title (fr)

Pistolet de nettoyage pour conduits

Publication

EP 1016470 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99124970 A

Priority

  • DE 19857975 A
  • DE 19857976 A

Abstract (en)

A pressurized hose(8) carrying water or some other fluid is connected to a connecting piece(7) directing fluid to a mixing chamber(4), and also connected to the water supply system. A shut-off control ball valve(10) is fitted on the connecting piece. The compressed air passage(5) in the gun's body(3) is encompassed by an annular gap(6) and leads to the mixing chamber. The connecting piece branches in the region of the annular gap in a position which is set back in relation to the outlet of the compressed air passage.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Reinigungspistole für Rohrleitungen mit einem von Hand zu betätigenden Ventil (3), einem Druckluftanschluß (1) und einem druckfesten, geschlossenen Flüssigkeitsbehälter (14) sowie mit einem Reinigungsschlauch (8) vorgeschlagen, wobei der Reinigungsschlauch (8) aus einem Außenschlauch (6) und einem Innenschlauch (7) besteht. Der Außenschlauch (6) bildet eine Verlängerung eines am Ventil (3) angeschlossenen Druckluftschlauchs (5) und der Innenschlauch (7) ist an beiden Enden offen und hat einen in den Flüssigkeitsbehälter (14) ragenden Abzweigstutzen (15). Mit der Reinigungspistole läßt sich ein Tröpfchen-Luftgemisch in zu reinigende Rohrleitungen mit entsprechend hohem Druck einbringen, wodurch sich eine sehr gute Reinigungsleistung ergibt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 9/04; B05B 7/24; B08B 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/14 (2006.01); B05B 3/04 (2006.01); B05B 7/00 (2006.01); B05B 7/04 (2006.01); B05B 7/24 (2006.01); B05B 13/06 (2006.01); B08B 5/02 (2006.01); B08B 9/04 (2006.01); B05B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 5/02 (2013.01); B05B 1/14 (2013.01); B05B 3/0409 (2013.01); B05B 7/0037 (2013.01); B05B 7/0433 (2013.01); B05B 7/045 (2013.01); B05B 7/2437 (2013.01); B05B 13/0627 (2013.01); B05B 13/0636 (2013.01); B08B 9/0433 (2013.01); B08B 9/0497 (2013.01); B05B 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016470 A1 20000705

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020702

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE DK FR GB IT

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-08-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FIRMA SCHNEIDER DRUCKLUFT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FR GB IT

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI