Global Patent Index - EP 1016477 A3

EP 1016477 A3 2001-03-14 - Light metal forging material manufacturing method and forged member manufacturing method using the material

Title (en)

Light metal forging material manufacturing method and forged member manufacturing method using the material

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Schmiedematerial aus Leichtmetall und Herstellung eines geschmiedeten Gegenstandes aus diesem Material

Title (fr)

Procédé de production de matériau de forgeage en métal léger et méthode de fabrication d' un élément forgé à base de ce matériau

Publication

EP 1016477 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99125044 A

Priority

JP 37284098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1016477A2] This invention relates to a method for manufacturing a light metal forging material provided as a material to be subjected to a forging process for obtaining a light metal forged member, by charging a light metal molten material into the molding cavity of a specified molding die so as to form a forging material and subjecting the forging material to a specified heat treatment before the forging process, there is generated a blister attributed to internal gas expansion in the material, thereby, in obtaining a finished product made of light metal by forming a forging material and forging the material, a blister associated with heat treatment is reliably prevented from being generated in a product (forged member) through this forging process. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 17/00; C22F 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 21/04 (2006.01); B21J 5/00 (2006.01); B22D 17/00 (2006.01); C22C 1/02 (2006.01); C22C 23/02 (2006.01); C22F 1/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/04 (2006.01); C22F 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/06 (2013.01); C22F 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016477 A2 20000705; EP 1016477 A3 20010314; JP 2000197956 A 20000718; KR 20000048268 A 20000725; TW 464695 B 20011121

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-17 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020219

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010525

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI