Global Patent Index - EP 1016525 A2

EP 1016525 A2 2000-07-05 - Liquid-ejecting head, liquid-ejecting method and liquid-ejecting printing apparatus

Title (en)

Liquid-ejecting head, liquid-ejecting method and liquid-ejecting printing apparatus

Title (de)

Flüssigkeitsausstosskopf, Flüssigkeitsausstossverfahren und Flüssigkeitsausstossdruckgerät

Title (fr)

Tête à jet de liquide, méthode d'ejection de liquide et appareil d'impression à jet de liquide

Publication

EP 1016525 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99310604 A

Priority

  • JP 37765298 A
  • JP 12072399 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a liquid-ejecting head, a method of ejecting liquid, and a liquid-ejecting printing apparatus, which permit an image-printing with the high quality by stabilizing volumes, flying velocities, and deposition points of ejected liquid droplets and preventing the generation of splash or mist of the liquid droplets. Thus, a heater (2) having a heating portion on the side of the liquid chamber which is broader than a heating portion of the opposite side of the liquid chamber relative to a projected point (z) where a centroid of any cross section of the orifice (5) in parallel with the substrate is projected on the substrate. A shape of a cross section of the orifice (5) in parallel with the substrate which is projected on the substrate from the side of the orifice plate has a combination of two ellipse portions (A1, A2) figures in which a centroid and a plan of the heater (2) are coincident with each other. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/1404 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14169 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14185 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14387 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016525 A2 20000705; EP 1016525 A3 20010103; EP 1016525 B1 20090114; DE 69940298 D1 20090305; US 6527376 B1 20030304

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161230

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151231

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090114

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2009-12-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091015

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090425

2009-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090114

2009-03-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69940298 P 20090305

2009-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2009-01-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050602

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010517

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41J 2/05 A, 7B 41J 2/14 B

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI