Global Patent Index - EP 1016535 A2

EP 1016535 A2 2000-07-05 - Thermal transfer printer

Title (en)

Thermal transfer printer

Title (de)

Thermotransferdrucker

Title (fr)

Imprimante par transfert thermique

Publication

EP 1016535 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99107934 A

Priority

  • EP 99107934 A
  • EP 99100004 A

Abstract (en)

The printer has a guide arrangement (2) for the medium to be printed and a print unit (1) containing a printing mechanism (3) and a transport unit for the thermal transfer tape (4). Drive unit acting directly on the thermal transfer tape moves the tape past the printing mechanism at a tape transport speed matching the transport speed of the medium to be printed.

Abstract (de)

Um einen Thermotransferdrucker zu schaffen, bei dem die Bandlaufgeschwindigkeit des Thermotransferbandes (4) und die Druckgeschwindigkeit des Druckmediums auf einfache Weise synchronisierbar sind und der zudem wenig anfällig für Störungen ist, wird vorgeschlagen, daß eine direkt auf das Thermotransferband (4) wirkende Antriebseinheit vorgesehen ist, die das Thermotransferband (4) mit einer auf die Vorschubgeschwindigkeit des zu bedruckenden Mediums abgestimmten Bandlaufgeschwindigkeit am Druckwerk (3) vorbeibewegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/325

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/325 (2006.01); B41J 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/007 (2013.01); B41J 2/325 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR LU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016535 A2 20000705; EP 1016535 A3 20010425; EP 1016535 B1 20060719; US 6384855 B1 20020507

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120422

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-02-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59913685

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120422

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 333373 T

- Effective date: 20120422

2012-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHEIDT & BACHMANN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20120430

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110414

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110414

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110510

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110414

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20110429

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070420

2007-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913685 P 20060831

2006-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR LU

2004-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041005

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE FR LU

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010602

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR LU

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI