Global Patent Index - EP 1016556 A2

EP 1016556 A2 2000-07-05 - Vehicle tyre

Title (en)

Vehicle tyre

Title (de)

Fahrzeugreifen

Title (fr)

Bandage pneumatique pour véhicule

Publication

EP 1016556 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99310321 A

Priority

JP 37484198 A

Abstract (en)

A vehicle tyre (1) comprises a tread provided with a tread pattern (2S) made up of circumferentially arranged design units (4) having a plurality of pitch lengths Pi (i=1 to j) including a minimum pitch length Pl and a maximum pitch length Pj, each of the design units (4) comprising at least one groove (3,5) having side walls (Gw) each having an inclination angle alpha i in a cross section parallel to the tyre equator (CO), and the inclination angle alpha 1 in the design unit having the minimum pitch length P1 is less than the inclination angle alpha j in the design unit having the maximum pitch length Pj, whereby the rigidity difference between the design units (4) having different pitch lengths is decreased. Preferably, the angle alpha i in a design unit having a pitch length Pi is not more than the angle alpha i+1 in a design unit having the next longer pitch length Pi+1. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60C 11/00; B60C 11/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60C 11/03 (2006.01); B60C 11/00 (2006.01); B60C 11/04 (2006.01); B60C 11/11 (2006.01); B60C 11/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60C 11/0318 (2013.01); B60C 11/13 (2013.01); B60C 2011/0374 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016556 A2 20000705; EP 1016556 A3 20001213; EP 1016556 B1 20030917; DE 69911366 D1 20031023; DE 69911366 T2 20040408; JP 2000198321 A 20000718; JP 3238376 B2 20011210; US 2002153077 A1 20021024; US 7625456 B2 20091201

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071221

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071221

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071210

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061220

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69911366 P 20031023

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010522

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI