Global Patent Index - EP 1016593 A1

EP 1016593 A1 2000-07-05 - Cigarette package and method and apparatus for its manufacture

Title (en)

Cigarette package and method and apparatus for its manufacture

Title (de)

Zigarettenpackung sowie Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen derselben

Title (fr)

Paquet de cigarettes ainsi que procédé et dispositif pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 1016593 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99124165 A

Priority

DE 19859949 A

Abstract (en)

The cigarette pack has a cut element (10) of thin packaging material, e.g. paper, silver foil or similar, for enveloping a group of cigarettes so that the envelope forms a continuous, closed base or side wall near a narrow surface, i.e. a base surface or a lateral surface. The base wall (11) or the side wall of the cut element is bounded by impressed lines (19,20) near (rectangular) folded edges with respect to bounding walls of the envelope Independent claims are also included for an arrangement for manufacturing a cigarette pack and for a method of manufacturing a cigarette pack.

Abstract (de)

Bei der Herstellung von Zigarettenpackungen mit Innenumhüllung aus dünnem Verpackungsmaterial wird der Zuschnitt (10) der Innenumhüllung mit Prägungen, nämlich Querprägelinien (19, 20) versehen, die eine bei der U-förmigen Umhüllung einer Zigarettengruppe (23) von dieser zuerst erfaßte Bodenwand (11) begrenzen. Durch die Prägelinien (19, 20) ist die mechanische Belastung der Zigarettengruppe bei der U-förmigen Faltung reduziert. Darüber hinaus wird ein Zigarettenförderer (25) für die Zuführung der Zigarettengruppen (23) schwellend angetrieben, also mit geringerer Geschwindigkeit bei Übernahme eines Zuschnitts (10) und mit entsprechend höherer Geschwindigkeit im übrigen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 19/22; B65B 19/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 5/06 (2006.01); B65B 19/22 (2006.01); B65B 19/28 (2006.01); B65D 85/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/228 (2013.01); B65B 19/221 (2013.01); B65B 19/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19859949 A1 20000629; BR 9907437 A 20000815; CN 1168642 C 20040929; CN 1258629 A 20000705; EP 1016593 A1 20000705; EP 1016593 B1 20021002; JP 2000191064 A 20000711; US 6523682 B1 20030225

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902918

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121203

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121203

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121203

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101218

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101201

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902918 20021107

2002-10-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001004

2001-04-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI