Global Patent Index - EP 1016594 A2

EP 1016594 A2 2000-07-05 - Method and apparatus for packaging individual articles in stacks containing several individual articles

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for packaging individual articles in stacks containing several individual articles

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Verpackung von Einzelstücken zu mehrere Einzelstücke enthaltende Stangen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour emballer des articles individuels en piles contenant plusieurs articles individuels

Publication

EP 1016594 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99126242 A

Priority

  • DE 19860863 A
  • DE 19920707 A

Abstract (en)

The individual pieces (A) are tested to ensure freedom from faults, and only non-faulty individual pieces are used to complete an assembled stack packing in the form of a stick. Groups (G) of individual pieces are stacked, esp. for packing in to sticks. Several individual pieces are firstly individually delivered in a reception position (P1) and then stacked to form a group. In addition and there are delivered formed in stacks at an output position (P2) and delivered together as a group.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Einrichtung zur Verpackung von Einzelstücken (A) zu mehrere Einzelstücke enthaltende Stangen, und insbesondere ein Verfahren und eine Einrichtung zur Stapelbildung von Einzelstücken, die durch eine Einzelstück-Bewertungseinrichtung (K) hinsichtlich ihrer Fehlerfreiheit erfaßt werden, worauf nur fehlerfreie Einzelstücke einer Gruppierung und Stapelbildung unterworfen werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 57/14; B65B 35/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 35/46 (2006.01); B65B 57/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 57/14 (2013.01); B65B 35/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016594 A2 20000705; EP 1016594 A3 20000927

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021224

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE GB IT LI

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010326

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001215

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI