Global Patent Index - EP 1016594 A3

EP 1016594 A3 2000-09-27 - Method and apparatus for packaging individual articles in stacks containing several individual articles

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for packaging individual articles in stacks containing several individual articles

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Verpackung von Einzelstücken zu mehrere Einzelstücke enthaltende Stangen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour emballer des articles individuels en piles contenant plusieurs articles individuels

Publication

EP 1016594 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99126242 A

Priority

  • DE 19860863 A
  • DE 19920707 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1016594A2] The individual pieces (A) are tested to ensure freedom from faults, and only non-faulty individual pieces are used to complete an assembled stack packing in the form of a stick. Groups (G) of individual pieces are stacked, esp. for packing in to sticks. Several individual pieces are firstly individually delivered in a reception position (P1) and then stacked to form a group. In addition and there are delivered formed in stacks at an output position (P2) and delivered together as a group.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 57/14; B65B 35/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 35/46 (2006.01); B65B 57/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 57/14 (2013.01); B65B 35/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016594 A2 20000705; EP 1016594 A3 20000927

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021224

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE GB IT LI

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010326

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001215

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI