Global patent index - EP 1016599 A1

EP 1016599 A1 2000-07-05 - Two-lobed filter bag for products for infusion and method for making the same

Title (en)

Two-lobed filter bag for products for infusion and method for making the same

Title (de)

Doppelkammer-Filterbeutel für Aufgussprodukte und Verfahren zur Herstellung desselben

Title (fr)

Sachet filtre à deux compartiments pour produits obtenus par infusion et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1016599 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830793 A

Priority

IT BO980715 A

Abstract (en)

A two-lobed filter bag (1) envisages a thread (6), whose end (6a), which defines a point of connection (A) with the filter bag (1), is attached to the free end (3c) of one of the lobes (3) forming the bag, and whose other end (6b), which is connected to a pick-up label (7), is attached to the free end (2c) of the other lobe (2), so that the portion (P) of thread (6) between the two ends (6a, 6b) is positioned, in a packaging configuration, on surfaces (2a, 3a) of the lobes (2, 3) in contact with one another and/or the base (5) of the filter bag (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/00; B65B 29/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 29/04 (2006.01); B65D 81/00 (2006.01); B65D 85/812 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/812 (2013.01); B65B 29/04 (2013.01); B65D 85/808 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

IT 1187308 A

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016599 A1 20000705; EP 1016599 B1 20030723; DE 69909726 D1 20030828; DE 69909726 T2 20040722; IT 1304448 B1 20010319; IT BO980715 A1 20000626; IT BO980715 D0 19981224

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150226 AND 20150304

2009-11-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20091022 AND 20091028

2004-08-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040426

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69909726

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-07-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020313

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI