Global patent index - EP 1016600 A2

EP 1016600 A2 2000-07-05 - Waste disposal containers

Title (en)

Waste disposal containers

Title (de)

Entsorgungsbehälter

Title (fr)

Récipients à déchets

Publication

EP 1016600 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99308892 A

Priority

GB 9824327 A

Abstract (en)

The invention provides a set of containers 242, 244, 246 comprising a plurality of smaller containers suitable for holding waste at one location (e.g. within a building); and a plurality of larger containers 242, 244, 246 suitable for holding waste at another location (e.g. outside a building); at least one of the smaller containers having one or more ventilation openings in at least a side wall thereof and containing an air-permeable liner for receiving organic compostable waste, and optionally being provided with a lid; and at least one of the larger containers having a lid, and one or more ventilation openings in at least the side wall thereof, so as to allow ventilation of an air permeable liner containing organic compostable waste placed in the said larger container when the lid of the larger container is closed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 1/00; B65F 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/00 (2006.01); B65F 1/02 (2006.01); B65F 1/06 (2006.01); B65F 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/0053 (2013.01); B65F 1/02 (2013.01); B65F 1/06 (2013.01); B65F 2001/0086 (2013.01); B65F 2001/1489 (2013.01); B65F 2210/1121 (2013.01); B65F 2210/1125 (2013.01); B65F 2210/1126 (2013.01); B65F 2210/1128 (2013.01); B65F 2210/181 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2343366 A 20000510; GB 9926317 D0 20000112; EP 1016600 A2 20000705; EP 1016600 A3 20000816; GB 9824327 D0 19981230

INPADOC legal status

2002-04-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-03-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010217

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI