Global Patent Index - EP 1016603 A3

EP 1016603 A3 2001-05-09 - Method and device for feeding signatures

Title (en)

Method and device for feeding signatures

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Zufuhr von Signaturen

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour alimenter des cahiers

Publication

EP 1016603 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99124017 A

Priority

US 22214898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1016603A2] The supply system is designed so that the supply units (28) deflect a first driven belt, which can be brought into contact with the stack and includes a deflection section (41). Which deflects the flat products (14) in a specified direction. The deflection section includes a second belt, which can work in conjunction with the first belt (42).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/08; B65H 3/36; B65H 5/02; B65H 39/043

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42C 1/00 (2006.01); B42C 19/00 (2006.01); B65G 59/06 (2006.01); B65H 3/04 (2006.01); B65H 39/043 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 39/043 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42322 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016603 A2 20000705; EP 1016603 A3 20010509; DE 19959098 A1 20000706; JP 2000211752 A 20000802; US 6213457 B1 20010410

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 3/08 A, 7B 65H 5/02 B, 7B 65H 3/36 B, 7B 65H 39/043 B

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI