Global Patent Index - EP 1016606 A1

EP 1016606 A1 2000-07-05 - Feeder

Title (en)

Feeder

Title (de)

Anleger

Title (fr)

Margeur

Publication

EP 1016606 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811270 A

Priority

EP 98811270 A

Abstract (en)

The feeder is designed so that the means, arranged between the discharge drum (1,20) and the opening system (9,10) are designed by a pocket wheel (15) or a bucket or pocket chain (50,fig.5) which are arranged for the reception of the printed sheets (2) supplied front folded with rotating pockets (5), and a conveying organ (22,26,36) pre-connected at this.

Abstract (de)

Der Anleger (60) besteht aus Abzugstrommel (1) auf, die zum Abziehen von gefalzten Bogen (2) aus einem Stapel (3) am Umfang Greifmittel (4) aufweist. Mit den genannten Greifmitteln (4) und Transportmitteln werden die vom Stapel (3) einzel abgezogenen Bogen (2) mit vorauslaufendem Falz (6) in eine Tasche (5) eingelegt. Mit weiteren Mitteln (7) werden die Bogen (2) der Tasche (5) entnommen und mit der offenen Seite (8) voraus Öffnungstrommeln (9,10) zugeführt. Es sind mehrere Taschen (5) vorgesehen und die vom Stapel (3) abgezogenen Bogen (2) werden mit den genannten Greifmitteln (4) nacheinander in diese Taschen (5) eingelegt. Mit den weiteren Mitteln (7) werden die in die Taschen (5) eingelegten Bogen (2) nacheinander den Öffnungstrommeln (9,10) zugeführt. Die Verweilzeit der Bogen (2) in den Taschen (5) ist ein Vielfaches eines Anlegertaktes. Diese lange Verweilzeit ermöglicht eine Beruhigung und genaue Ausrichtung der Bogen (2) in den Taschen (5). Auch bei hohen Geschwindigkeiten ist eine sichere Übergabe der Bogen an Öffnungstrommeln (9,10) gewährleistet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 5/30; B65H 29/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/06 (2006.01); B65H 5/30 (2006.01); B65H 29/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/307 (2013.01); B65H 29/40 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4476 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4531 (2013.01); B65H 2404/655 (2013.01); B65H 2405/552 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2301/4476 + B65H 2220/01 + B65H 2220/02

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016606 A1 20000705; EP 1016606 B1 20070523; DE 59814015 D1 20070705; JP 2000198598 A 20000718; JP 4790101 B2 20111012; US 2003047867 A1 20030313; US 6793211 B2 20040921

INPADOC legal status


2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121228

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121228

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121231

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121231

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-10-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59814015

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121228

2013-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20111220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120102

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101220

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101224

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080226

2007-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070702

2007-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59814015 P 20070705

2007-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2007-05-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001016

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI