Global patent index - EP 1016706 A3

EP 1016706 A3 2001-01-17 - Lubricating oil composition for internal combustion engines having improved thermal oxidation durability and detergency

Title (en)

Lubricating oil composition for internal combustion engines having improved thermal oxidation durability and detergency

Title (de)

Schmierölzusammensetzungen für Brennkraftmaschinen mit verbesserter thermischer Oxidationsstabilität und mit verbesserter Reinigungswirkung

Title (fr)

Composition d'huile lubrifiante pour moteurs à combustion interne ayant des propriétés d'oxydation thermique et de détergence améliorées

Publication

EP 1016706 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99310591 A

Priority

JP 37312298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1016706A2] A lubricating oil composition for internal combustion engines comprising a base oil of lubricating viscosity having a kinematic viscosity of 22 to 300 mm<2>/s at 40 DEG C, an overbased alkyloxybenzenesulfonate detergent, a neutral or basic salicylate detergent, an ashless dispersant, a zinc dialkyldithiophosphate, and a nonmetallic oxidation inhibitor. The lubricating oil composition of the present invention has enough stability against thermal oxidation and enough detergency at elevated temperatures to comply with the severe operating conditions required for modern diesel engines and to satisfactorily lubricate the engine even under severe friction conditions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 163/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 167/00 (2006.01); C10M 163/00 (2006.01); C10N 10/04 (2006.01); C10N 20/02 (2006.01); C10N 20/04 (2006.01); C10N 30/04 (2006.01); C10N 30/10 (2006.01); C10N 40/25 (2006.01); C10N 60/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 163/00 (2013.01); C10M 2207/023 (2013.01); C10M 2207/024 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/027 (2013.01); C10M 2207/028 (2013.01); C10M 2207/144 (2013.01); C10M 2207/146 (2013.01); C10M 2207/262 (2013.01); C10M 2207/287 (2013.01); C10M 2207/288 (2013.01); C10M 2207/289 (2013.01); C10M 2215/04 (2013.01); C10M 2215/086 (2013.01); C10M 2215/24 (2013.01); C10M 2215/26 (2013.01); C10M 2215/28 (2013.01); C10M 2217/046 (2013.01); C10M 2217/06 (2013.01); C10M 2219/046 (2013.01); C10M 2219/084 (2013.01); C10M 2219/089 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10M 2227/061 (2013.01); C10N 2210/02 (2013.01); C10N 2240/10 (2013.01); C10N 2240/101 (2013.01); C10N 2240/104 (2013.01); C10N 2240/106 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 163/00 + C10M 129/10 + C10M 129/54 + C10M 129/76 + C10M 133/52 + C10M 133/56 + C10M 137/10 + C10M 159/22 + C10M 159/24

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016706 A2 20000705; EP 1016706 A3 20010117; CA 2293210 A1 20000628; JP 2000192069 A 20000711

INPADOC legal status

2003-02-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020702

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010305

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI