Global patent index - EP 1016742 A1

EP 1016742 A1 2000-07-05 - Montagevorrichting einer zylindrischen Rundkamm-Reinigungsbürste mit automatischem Abnutzungsausgleich einer Kämmaschine

Title (en)

Montagevorrichting einer zylindrischen Rundkamm-Reinigungsbürste mit automatischem Abnutzungsausgleich einer Kämmaschine

Title (de)

Mounting apparatus of a cylindrical cleaning brush with automatic wear compensation for a cylindrical comb of a rectilinear comber

Title (fr)

Dispositif de montage d'une brosse cylindrique de nettoyage du peigne cylindrique d'une peigneuse rectiligne à compensation automatique de l'usure de ladite brosse

Publication

EP 1016742 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98440299 A

Priority

EP 98440299 A

Abstract (en)

The mounting of a cylindrical cleaning brush at the circular comb of a comber is in an assembly which has a fixed comb (1), a cylinder (2), a cylindrical cleaning brush (3), a doffer (4) and a doffer comb (5) to work an incoming fiber web (6). A system (7) gives a rapid assembly and dismantling action on the brush cylinder (3) on a drive shaft (3'), together with an automatic compensation system (8) for the wear on the brush (3). The drive shaft (3') for the brush cylinder (3) is longer than the brush (3). One end of the shaft has a fitting for the assembly/dismantling system (7), and the shaft has an inner limit stop and centering unit for the fitted brush cylinder (3). The shaft fitting has a structured profile to be gripped by the assembly-dismantling system and give it an axial block at the shaft such as a tapping to take a locking bolt. The inner centering unit is a cone, fitted to the drive shaft (3'), working with a positioning cuff at the assembly/dismantling system (7) for the brush cylinder (3). The assembly/dismantling system (7) has a handwheel for movement with the positioning cuff. The far end of the handwheel is structured to fit the splined shaft and a female cone to work with the centering cone. An elastic stop acts on the positioning cuff, against a return spring without rotation. It also has snap connections to engage fittings at the end of the center tube of the brush cylinder (3). The snap connections are friction grips with at least one elastic, metal or synthetic rush in a circular groove which grips by friction within the brush cylinder tube with the elastic stop. The system (8) to give an automatic compensation for brush (3) wear has at least one actuator (19) working with the swing support (16) for the brush drive shaft (3'), to swing it on its axis in at least one perpendicular direction, through a control unit (20). The actuator (19) has a conventional or step electromotor (21), which is reversible and is fitted with a reduction gearing (22). The motor rotation is converted (23) mechanically into a setting movement for the brush cylinder (3). The motor drive output is engaged and disengaged by a clutch between the motor (21) and the mechanical movement converter (23) through a manual control (24). The mechanical movement converter (23) has an initial transmissions section such as a pinion, drive wheel or pulley (25) on the motor drive shaft. It acts with a second transmission pinion, drive wheel or pulley unit (26) and through a thrust bearing (28), to operate a screw bolt (27) through a screw block (29) at the support arm (16), to act as a spindle to move it in one of two directions. The spindle screw (27) can be operated by the electromotor (21) through a toothed segment which pivots on the frame (18) acting on a push rod, eccentric or cam to move the support arm (16). The set position of the swing support arm (16) for the brush cylinder drive shaft (3') is held in place by a variety of systems such as springs, elastic washers, pneumatic or hydraulic units, and the like. The control unit (20) has a programmable follow-up system, to set the phased shifts of the brush support arm (16), and operate the motor to ensure that the diameter of the brush cylinder is effectively placed as the bristles wear. The brush assembly/dismantling system (7) has a bearing for the movement of the positioning cuff, with bearing rollers at its guide. The guide has a curvature matching the swing movements of the brush support arm (16), and a guide plate to hold the roller bearing at the frame (18) in front of a passage opening at an upper covering surface. The automatic compensation system has a moving stop against the roller bearing of the assembly/dismantling system (7). It is mounted to a swing lever at one end of the frame (18) with an operating unit at the other end of the lever. The operating unit has a swing lever fitted to the frame (18) at one end with a rod of variable length at the other end. It is worked by a pedal or lever, with a limit stop to define the movement range. It is also fitted with a shock absorber. The rod with a variable length is telescopic, where an inner section slides within an outer sheath. It has a spring and a retaining ring. The operating unit can also be a piston acting on the lever, set by a control button.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un dispositif de montage d'une brosse cylindrique de nettoyage du cylindre de peignage d'une peigneuse rectiligne, essentiellement constituée par un peigne fixe (1), par un peigne cylindrique (2), par une brosse cylindrique de nettoyage (3), par un doffer (4) et par un peigne détacheur (5), traitant une nappe de fibres entrantes (6). Dispositif de montage caractérisé en ce qu'il est pourvu, d'une part, d'un moyen (7) de démontage, de remontage et de fixation rapides de la brosse cylindrique (3) sur son arbre d'entraînement (3') et, d'autre part, d'un moyen (8) de compensation automatique de l'usure de la brosse cylindrique (3). L'invention est plus particulièrement applicable dans le domaine de l'industrie textile, notamment des peigneuses rectilignes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 19/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 19/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016742 A1 20000705; EP 1016742 B1 20020313; DE 69804233 D1 20020418; DE 69804233 T2 20021121

INPADOC legal status

2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2005-12-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051229

2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-12-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041210

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040223

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-09-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69804233

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-18

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-03-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: MOUNTING APPARATUS OF A CYLINDRICAL CLEANING BRUSH WITH AUTOMATIC WEAR COMPENSATION FOR A CYLINDRICAL COMB OF A RECTILINEAR COMBER

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010316

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991117

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI