Global Patent Index - EP 1016743 A1

EP 1016743 A1 2000-07-05 - Device for the controlled displacement of a weft thread

Title (en)

Device for the controlled displacement of a weft thread

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum gesteuerten Bewegen eines Kettfadens

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le déplacement commandé d'un fil de trame

Publication

EP 1016743 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99811031 A

Priority

  • EP 99811031 A
  • EP 98811213 A

Abstract (en)

Mechanism (1) to move a warp yarn (9) in a loom has a swing pendulum (2) with an integrated electrical coil (3) and a fixed permanent magnet (4). Balanced settings of the pendulum give three positions, in each setting, where a balance is maintained by forces between the permanent magnet and energized coil in the upper and lower settings, and with the coil not energized for the center setting. Mechanism (1) to move a warp yarn (9) in a loom to place it in one of three positions, in the upper, center or lower setting. It has a swing pendulum (2) on an axis (20), with an integrated electrical coil (3) and a fixed permanent magnet (4). Preferred Features: The guide for the warp (9) is an eyelet (50) or hook at a sliding section (5), with a ribbon link (6) to the pendulum (2). The pendulum (2) has a strip laying surface (23) for the ribbon link (6), which can be ridged, giving a curved surface which follows a circle round the pendulum axis (20). Two sliding sections (5,5') move two warps (9). The movements are asymmetrical so that, with an energized coil (3), one warp (9) is in the upper position and the other warp is in the lower setting. When the coil (3) is not energized, both warps (9) are simultaneously at the center position. The sliding section (5) can be replaced by a guide to move a number of warps at the same time. The electrical coil (3) is a flat ring. The magnetic field generated by the coil is at the center point of the ring, parallel to the pendulum axis (20). The permanent magnet (4) has a plate shape, parallel to the coil. The magnetizing of the permanent magnet (4) is equal to the magnetic field of the coil, with an opposite orientation. Permanent magnets (4), of an identical configuration, can be at ferromagnetic carrier plates (7) on both sides of the pendulum (2). The pendulum (2) has at least one non-ferromagnetic plate (21) to carry the coil (3), to dampen the pendulum movements by eddy currents. Permanent magnets (4), each on one side of the pendulum (2) in pairs, give the balanced settings for the upper and lower positions, with opposing orientations in the pairs.

Abstract (de)

Die Einrichtung (1) bewegt gesteuert mittels einer punktuellen Zwangsführung einen Kettfaden (9) zwischen drei Positionen, nämlich einer mittleren, einer oberen sowie einer unteren Position. Sie umfasst ein um eine Achse (20) verschwenkbares Pendel (2), in das eine elektrische Spule (3) integriert ist, und raumfeste Permanentmagnete (4). Durch Gleichgewichtsstellungen des Pendels sind die genannten Positionen gegeben, wobei in diesen Stellungen Kräfte, die auf das Pendel wirken, jeweils in einem Gleichgewicht stehen. Die Gleichgewichtsstellungen für die obere bzw. untere Position sind mittels Kräften zwischen den Permanentmagneten und der stromführenden Spule erzeugbar; die Gleichgewichtsstellung für die mittlere Position ist durch das Pendel mit stromloser Spule gegeben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03C 13/00; D03C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03C 7/00 (2006.01); D03C 11/00 (2006.01); D03C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03C 13/00 (2013.01); D03C 7/00 (2013.01); D03C 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016743 A1 20000705; EP 1016743 B1 20030416

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101110

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905063

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SULTEX A.G.

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091110

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091020

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091120

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040119

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905063 P 20030522

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2003-03-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULTEX AG

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020125

2001-04-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI